Serial No. 2
(w.e.f 01 April 2018)
THE
DELHI GOLF CLUB
Dr.
Zakir Hussain Road, New Delhi - 110 003
Minutes of the
meeting of the Membership Sub Committee of the Delhi Golf Club held on Thursday,
21st June 2018 at 12 noon in the Board Room.
PRESENT:
Mr.
Rohit Sabherwal |
Chairman |
Mr. Satish Girotra |
Co- Chairman
|
Mr.
Prabhash Jain |
Member |
Capt.
L.S. Bahl |
Member |
Maj.
Gen. K.M.S. Shergill |
Captain |
Mr.
Vivek Chandra |
GC
member |
|
|
Mr.
Rajiv Hora |
Secretary
|
LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Mr.
Vijay Kumar Topa |
Treasurer
|
|
|
1. NOTING OF
MINUTES OF THE MEETING HELD ON 23rd APRIL 2018.
The minutes were noted.
2. RESIGNATION:
The Committee accepted the following resignations with regret:
1.
Sqn Ldr.
J.P. Singh (S-548) resigning as ‘M/W’ member.
2.
Mrs. K.K.
Khanna (K041) resigning as ‘C’ member.
3.
Mr.
Pushplata Ghai (WS-156) resigning as ‘SS’ member.
4.
Mrs.
Rajni Saxena (SS256) resigning as ‘SS’ member.
3. APPROVAL
OF APPLICATIONS FOR TENURE
MEMBERSHIP: -
(A) FOREIGN TENURE:
(1) Mr. Hisaya Sakata, Office Worker,
Handicap 13 from Jaypee Greens is recommended for Foreign Tenure ‘A’
membership. (Nationality: Japanese)
(2) Mr. Keishi Iwamoto, General Manager,
M/s. Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Handicap 8 from Elite Golf Solutions
is recommended for Foreign Tenure ‘A’ membership. (Nationality: Japanese)
(3) Mr. Takayuki Inaba, Managing Director,
M/s. NEC Technologies India Pvt. Ltd., Handicap 17 from Jaypee Greens is
recommended for Foreign Tenure ‘M/W’ membership. (Nationality: Japanese)
(4) Mr. Mehul Sehgal, Business, (presently
is a Foreign Tenure ‘M/W’ member and current membership will expire on
15.07.2018) is recommended for Foreign Tenure ‘M/W’ membership. (Nationality: Canadian)
(B) GOVERNMENT TENURE:
(1) Mrs. Shubhra Singh, Principal Resident
Commissioner, (previously was Government Tenure ‘C’ member) is recommended for
Government Tenure ‘C’ membership.
(2) Mrs. Kimbuong Kipgen, Secretary, PESB,
Handicap 20 from Hindan Sports Complex is recommended for Government Tenure
‘M/W’ membership.
(3) Mr. Kamal Nath, Member of Parliament,
(previously was a Government Tenure ‘C’ member) is recommended for Government
Tenure ‘C’ membership.
(4) Mrs. Stuti Narain Kacker, Chairperson,
National Commission for Protection of Child Rights (previously was Tenure ‘M/W’
member) is recommended for Government Tenure ‘M/W’ membership.
(5) Mr. Kesineni Srinivas, Politician
(previously was a Government Tenure ‘M/W’ member) is recommended for Government
Tenure ‘M/W’ membership.
(6) Mr. Sunil Kumar Singh, Commissioner of
Income Tax, (previously was a Government Tenure ‘M/W’ member) is recommended
for Government Tenure ‘M/W’ membership.
(7) Mr. Arun Jaitley, Minister of Finance
& Corporate Affairs (previously was a Government Tenure ‘C’ member) is
recommended for Government Tenure ‘C’ membership.
(C)
CHANGE OF
CORPORATE NOMINEE:
(1) Mr. Ajit Kumar, Chief General Manager,
M/s. Indian Oil Corporation Limited, Handicap 18 from Patna Golf Club is
recommended for Corporate Tenure ‘M/W’ membership in place of Mr. P.K. Agarwal
(CPA76).
(2) Mr. Ashish Mehrotra Managing Director
& CEO, M/s. Max India Ltd., (previously was a Corporate ‘A’ member) is
recommended for Corporate Tenure ‘A’ membership in place of Dr. Pervez Ali
Ahmad (CPB118).
(3) Mr. Tanmoy Chakrabarty, Group Government
Affairs Officer, M/s. Tata Services Limited, is recommended for Corporate
Tenure ‘C’ membership subject to Golf Test / Handicap Certificate in place of
Mr. Bharat Wakhlu (CPA100)
(4) Mr. Suresh Kumar, Advisor, M/s. HCL
Infosystems Ltd, Handicap 18 from Classic Golf & Country Club is
recommended for Corporate Tenure ‘M/W’ membership in place of Mr. Ravi Khanna.
4.
APPROVAL
OF CORPORATE MEMBERSHIP:
The following Corporate memberships and
its nominees were approved:
(1)
M/s.
Tata Sons Limited
·
Mr. Tanmoy Chakraboarty, Government Affairs
Officers, M/s. Tata Sons Limited is recommended for Corporate Tenure ‘C’
membership subject to Golf Test / Handicap Certificate.
·
Mr. S. Jaishankar, President Corporate Affairs, M/s.
Tata Sons Limited is recommended for Corporate Tenure ‘C’ membership subject to
Golf Test / Handicap Certificate.
(2)
M/s.
BPTP Limited
·
Mr. Kabur Chawla, Managing Director, M/s. BPTP
Limited, is recommended for Corporate Tenure ‘C’ membership subject to Golf
Test / Handicap Certificate.
·
Mrs. Punam Chawla, Director, M/s. BPTP Limited,
Handicap 23 from Noida Golf Course is recommended for Corporate Tenure ‘M/W’
membership.
(3)
M/s.
The Motor & General Finance Ltd.
·
Mr. Rajiv Gupta, CMD, M/s. The Motor & General
Finance Ltd. is recommended for Corporate Tenure ‘C’ membership subject to Golf
Test / Handicap Certificate.
·
Mr. Inderjeev Singh Kohli, Advisor, M/s. The Motor
& General Finance Ltd. is recommended for Corporate Tenure ‘C’ membership
subject to Golf Test / Handicap Certificate.
(4)
M/s.
ONGC Videsh Limited
·
Mr. Narendra Kumar Verma, Managing Director, M/s.
ONGC Videsh Limited (previously was Corporate Tenure ‘C’ member) is recommended
for Corporate Tenure ‘C’ membership.
·
Mr. Vivek Anand, Director (Finance), M/s. ONGC
Videsh Limited, is recommended for Corporate Tenure ‘C’ membership subject to
Golf Test / Handicap Certificate.
5.
UPGRADATION
The Sub Committee recommended that the following members be
upgraded:
(a)
‘M/W’ to
‘A’
Indian
Business Category:
S.No. |
Name |
M.
No. |
D.O.E. as M/W
Member |
H’CAP |
No.
of Cards |
||
Mar Apr
May |
|||||||
1.
|
BRIG D S JAGGI |
J135 |
04.12.1997 |
17 |
17 |
17 |
20 |
2.
|
DR U.K. KOHLI |
K380 |
18.05.1999 |
12 |
13 |
13 |
22 |
3.
|
MR KAWARJIT SINGH |
S709 |
18.05.1999 |
17 |
16 |
13 |
50 |
4.
|
MR VIKRAM BHARDWAJ |
B427 |
27.12.2000 |
11 |
9 |
8 |
22 |
5.
|
MR HARSH GUPTA |
G225 |
27.12.2000 |
3 |
3 |
2 |
28 |
In Indian Business category, there are
11 members who became ‘M/W’ members on 27.12.2000 and meet the criteria for
upgradation from ‘M/W’ to ‘A’. At
present, we have only 2 vacancies.
Hence, we have adopted the following criteria for upgradation from ‘M/W’
to ‘A’ as per decision taken by MSC dated 31st October 2016.
(a) Date of becoming ‘M/W’ member
(b) Date of becoming ‘C’ member
(c) If the above two facts are identical, then Lower Handicap will become
determining criterion.
Indian Service
Category:
S.No. |
Name |
M.
No. |
D.O.E. as M/W
Member |
H’CAP |
No.
of Cards |
||
Mar Apr
May |
|||||||
1.
|
LT.COL. NAVJIT SINGH SANDHU |
S860 |
17.03.2017 |
10 |
10 |
10 |
20 from Black Elephant Training Area Patiala |
(b)
‘C’ to
‘M/W’
Indian Business Category:
S. No |
Name |
Mem.
No. |
DOE as
‘C’ Member |
Handicap |
||
‘A’ |
‘B’ |
|
||||
1.
|
MR. PRADEEP SOOD |
S886 |
10.05.2011 |
11 |
|
|
2.
|
MR PITAMBER PRAKASH
SAHNI |
S933 |
27.01.2014 |
|
12 |
|
3.
|
MR ASHWIN CHANDIOK |
C368 |
14.12.2015 |
|
6 |
|
4.
|
MR. RAVI KUMAR GHAI
|
G295 |
29.02.2016 |
|
9 |
|
5.
|
MRS JYOTIKA JHALANI |
J189 |
08.09.2017 |
16.5 from DLF Golf & Country Club |
||
6.
|
MR. ANIL BATRA |
B603 |
27.04.2018 |
7 |
|
|
7.
|
MS. ADITI GROVER
CHOPRA |
C376 |
27.04.2018 |
|
13 |
|
8.
|
MR. NEERAJ KUMAR
GUPTA |
G307 |
27.04.2018 |
15 |
|
|
9.
|
MR. TARUN GUPTA |
G308 |
27.04.2018 |
8 |
|
|
10.
|
MR. RAGHAV PURI |
P258 |
27.04.2018 |
3 |
|
|
11.
|
MR. ASHOK SWARUP |
S1010 |
27.04.2018 |
9 |
|
|
There are 26 vacancies in Indian Business
category for upgradation from ‘C’ to ‘M/W’.
However, there are only 11 members who fulfill the criteria for
upgradation.
Indian Service Category:
S. No |
Name |
Mem.
No. |
DOE as
‘C’ Member |
Handicap |
||
‘A’ |
‘B’ |
|
||||
1.
|
MS GAICHANGLUNGLIU
GAIDUANSING KAMEI |
K785 |
12.05.2017 |
|
14 |
|
There are 4 vacancies in Indian Service
category for upgradation from ‘C’ to ‘M/W’. However, there is only 1 member who
fulfills the criteria for upgradation.
6.
NEW
MEMBERSHIP
The Sub Committee recommended grant of Associate ‘C’ membership to
the following applicants:
(A)
INDIAN BUSINESS CATEGORY – 4 VACANCIES
S.no.
|
REG.
NO. & DATE |
NAME |
OCCUPATION |
PROPOSER |
SECONDER |
REMARKS |
1. |
2352 10.12.1988 |
Mr. Vijay
Kathuria |
CA |
Mr. Satish Sood |
Mr. Shiban Ganju
|
Handicap 18 from
Tollygunge Golf Club |
2. |
2115 14.12.1988 |
Mr. Devinder Pal
Singh |
Business |
Mr. P.N. Jha |
Mr. T.C. Chopra |
Handicap 18 from
Qutub Golf Course |
3. |
2354 21.12.1988 |
Mr. Ajay Bahl |
Business |
Mr. Prem Kumar Soi |
Mr. Manjit
Khanna |
Tested on
24.03.2018 |
4. |
2359 26.12.1988 |
Mr. Rakeshwar
Lall Sood |
Sr. Advocate |
Mr. Anil Sikand |
Mr. Prem Sikand |
Handicap 16 from
Naldehra Golf Club |
(B)
INDIAN SERVICE CATEGORY – 3 VACANCIES
S.
NO. |
REG.
NO. & DATE |
NAME |
OCCUPATION |
PROPOSER |
SECONDER |
REMARKS |
1.
|
1692 14.02.2001 |
Mr. Binod Kumar |
I.R.S |
Mr. Vinod Gupta |
Mr. Ajai Kapur |
Handicap 22 from
Noida Golf Course |
(AS
PER LETTER DT. 27.09.2012 FROM L&DO THAT 10% OF THE 20% VACANCIES TO BE
FILLED UP THE APPLICANTS FROM AMONGST THE JUDGES OF THE SUPREME COURT)
1 |
2184 19.11.2014 |
Justice Adarsh
Kumar Goel |
Supreme Court
Judge |
Justice Vikramjit Sen |
Justice G.S.
Sistani |
Presently is a
Tenure member |
2 |
2187 12.01.2015 |
Justice Sharad
Arvind Bobde |
Supreme Court
Judge |
Justice Vikramjit Sen |
Mr. Prabhash C.
Jain |
Presently is a
Tenure member |
(C)
DEPENDENTS APPLIED IN TIME – 10 VACANCIES
S. NO. |
REG.
NO. & DATE |
NAME |
D.O.B. |
PROPOSER |
SECONDER |
REMARKS |
1) |
5375 01.10.1999 |
Ms. Shamika
Bakhshi D/o. Mr. C.R.
Bakhshi |
01.10.1981 |
Mr. C.R. Bakhshi
|
Maj. Gen. H.K.
Bakhshi |
SD691 Courtesy Interview held on 03.05.2018 |
2) |
5379 28.10.1999 |
Mr. Pavit Singh
Sistani S/o. Mr. B.S.
Sistani |
09.09.1981 |
Mr. Mohanjit
Singh |
Mr. T.S. R.
Subramanian |
SD822 |
3) |
5386 06.12.1999 |
Mr. Kushagr
Khera S/o. Mr. Vinay
Khera |
21.11.1981 |
Lt. Gen.
Jagmohan Grover |
Mr. Tilak Raj
Sahgal |
SD677 |
4) |
5383 14.12.1999 |
Mr. Rajat
Sachdev S/o. Mr. K.B.
Sachdev |
24.12.1980 |
Mr. C.R. Bakshi |
Mr. A.S. Walia |
SD419 |
5) |
5387 14.12.1999 |
Ms. Neha Kohli D/o. Mr. S.P.
Kohli |
10.08.1981 |
Mr. S.P. Kohli |
Mr. P.S. Prasad |
SD828 |
6) |
5388 14.12.1999 |
Ms. Puneet Dugal D/o. Mr. H.S.
Dugal |
02.02.1979 |
Mr. Kiranjit
Singh |
Mr. Harjit Singh
Dugal |
SD148 |
7) |
5393 05.01.2000 |
Ms. Mallika
Kapur D/o. Mr. Deepak
Kapur |
11.12.1980 |
Mr. Surjit
Khanna |
Mr. T.R. Chadha |
SD428 |
8) |
5395 18.01.2000 |
Mr. Ashim Sood S/o. Maj. Gen.
S.D. Sood |
06.09.1979 |
Mr. LM. Kapur |
Mr. Simran Singh
|
SD735 |
9) |
5398 28.01.2000 |
Mr. Digvijay
Singh Jhala S/o. Mrs.
Rajkumari Reena Kumari |
18.08.1981 |
Mr. Rohesh
Bhandari |
Mr. Mukhinder
Singh |
SD666 |
10) |
5403 25.02.2000 |
Mr. Shiv Kapur S/o. Mr. Ravi
Kapur |
12-02-1982 |
Mr. Vidur Chopra
|
Mr. S.K. Khanna |
SD694 (Professional) |
·
The form
of Mr. Pratap Sandhu (DT-5384 dated 14.12.1999) was found to be incomplete as
there is no one who has proposed & seconded his application. It was decided
that he may be requested to get his application form proposed & seconded by
permanent ‘A’ members before the meeting with the General Committee.
·
It was
pointed out that, as per Article 10.A 2(i) those registrant applicants already
having a handicap of 3 or below for men and 6 or below for women on the Lodhi
Course or from a recognized Golf Club having an 18 holes Championship Course
with a minimum length of 6000 yards for men and 5000 yards for ladies may be
taken directly as a Mid-week member when their turn for membership of the Club
is due.
In the light of the above Article, the Committee recommended that Mr.
Shiv Kapur, (DT-5403 dated 25.02.2000) may be granted ‘M/W’ membership
(D)
DEPENDENTS APPLIED LATE – 1 VACANCY
S. NO. |
REG.
NO. & DATE |
NAME |
D.O.B. |
PROPOSER |
SECONDER |
REMARKS |
1. |
2648 01.10.1990 |
Mr. Ranjit Kumar
Rawlley S/o. Mr.
Ashok Ranganathan |
26.10.1964 |
Mr. A.
Ranganathan |
Mr. M.K. Modwel |
SD659 (Courtesy interview done) |
7.
LETTER
DATED 2nd MAY 2018 RECEIVED FROM M/S. BHASIN MOTORS INDIA PRIVATE
LIMITED FOR RENEWAL OF CORPORATE MEMBERSHIP (CURRENT MEMBERSHIP EXPIRED ON 19TH
MAY 2018 – APPLIED FOR 2ND TERM).
The Committee approved the renewal of
Corporate membership of M/s. Bhasin Motors India Private Limited
8.
LETTER
DATED 15TH MAY 2018 RECEIVED FROM M/S. ITC LIMITED FOR RENEWAL OF
CORPORATE MEMBERSHIP (CURRENT MEMBERSHIP WILL EXPIRE ON 7TH
SEPTEMBER 2018 – APPLIED FOR 3RD TERM).
The Committee approved the renewal of
Corporate membership of M/s. ITC Limited
9.
LETTER
DATED 15.05.2018 RECEIVED FROM MR. AMAN CHOPRA (IB-4213 DATED 07.05.1997)
REGARDING STATUS OF HIS APPLICATION.
The Committee noted that Mr. Aman Chopra applied for membership of the Club under Registration No. IB-4213
Dated 07.05.1997 in Indian Business category.
As per Audit Report, his application is
Non-Active due to non-payment of registration payment. As per Club record, the Club had received an
amount of Rs. 10,000/- on 07.05.1997 from Mr. Aman Chopra under receipt no.
20083631 dated 07.05.1997.
In view of the above, the Committee
decided that the application of Mr. Aman Chopra be made active and the
seniority will be counted from the date of application i.e. 07.05.1997.
10.
OTHER
POINTS:
(a)
EMAIL
DATED 27TH APRIL 2018 RECEIVED FROM M/S. SUDHIR GENSETS LIMITED FOR
RENEWAL OF CORPORATE MEMBERSHIP (CURRENT MEMBERSHIP EXPIRED ON 25.07.2018 –
APPLIED FOR 2ND TERM).
The Committee approved the renewal of
Corporate membership of M/s. Sudhir Gensets Limited.
(b)
LETTER
DATED 5TH MAY 2018 RECEIVED FROM COMMODORE AMIT BHANDARI (RETD)
(B-585) REGARDING UPGRADATION.
(c)
LETTER
DATED 28.05.2018 RECEIVED FROM JUSTICE MANMOHAN SARIN (RETD.) (IS- 1680 DT.
27.11.2000) REGARDING HIS APPLICATION.
(d)
LETTER
DATED 13.06.2018 RECEIVED FROM MR. DESH DEEPAK VERMA REGARDING HIS APPLICATION.
The above items (b), (c) & (d) were
deferred for the next meeting.
11.
VOTE OF THANKS: - There
being no other point, the meeting ended with a vote of thanks to the Chair.
Rajiv Hora |
Secretary |
Rohit
Sabherwal |
Chairman |